MS HB1014 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Repeal The Forest Harvesting Act, Sections 49-19-51 Through 49-19-77, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Requires The Leaving Of Pine And Hardwood Seed Trees When Harvesting Timber For Commercial Purposes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Forestry; repeal the Forest Harvest Act requiring leaving pine and hardwood seed trees when harvesting for commercial purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Morgan [R] | Rep. Randy Boyd [R] | Rep. Vince Mangold [R] | Rep. Bill Pigott [R] |
Rep. Preston Sullivan [D] | Rep. Shane Barnett [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Forestry |
2017-02-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-02 | House | Passed |
2017-01-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Forestry |