MS HB1006 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Enact The American Rescue Plan Act (arpa) Workforce Development And Retention Act; To State Legislative Findings And Intent; To Establish The Accelerate Mississippi Workforce Development Program; To Outline Requirements For The Application And For The Grant Awards; To Establish The Mississippi Health Sciences Training Infrastructure Grant Program; To Provide Reporting Requirements To The Governor And The Legislature By October 1 Of Each Year; To Require The Office Of Workforce Development To Certify To The Department Of Finance And Administration That Each Expenditure Appropriated To The Office Is In Compliance With United States Department Of The Treasury Criteria Regarding The Use Of Monies From The State Coronavirus State Fiscal Recovery Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
ARPA Workforce Development and Retention Act; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason White [R] | Rep. Donnie Scoggin [R] | Rep. Stephanie Foster [D] | Rep. John Faulkner [D] |
Rep. De Stamps [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-31 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Parker,England,Younger |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,White |
2022-03-08 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-24 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: EC To AP |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Economic and Workforce Development;Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed |
2022-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Appropriations |