MS HB1004 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-08 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Sections 65-43-1 Through 65-43-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorize Toll Roads And Toll Bridges, For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Toll Roads; bring forward code sections for possible amendment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Died On Calendar |
2018-02-07 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred To Transportation |