MS HB100 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Title Suff Do Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 77-3-721, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Statute That Requires All User Fees And Charges Collected Under The Mississippi Telephone Solicitation Act To Be Deposited Into The State General Fund; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MS Telephone Solicitation Act; extend repealer on requirement that fees be deposited into State General Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-02-16SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2021-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2021-02-11HousePassed
2021-02-10HouseRead the Third Time
2021-02-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-02-02HouseDR - TSDP: AP To AC
2021-01-28HouseDR - TSDP: AC To AP
2021-01-07HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
773721Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback