MS HB1 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 16 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-01-17 - Due From Governor 01/23/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Making An Appropriation To The State Department Of Education For The Purpose Of Providing Additional Funding For Teachers' Salaries For Fiscal Year 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; Department of Education for additional funding for teachers' salaries.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-17 Due From Governor 01/23/20
2020-01-16SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-01-16HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-01-16SenateReturned For Enrolling
2020-01-16SenateImmediate Release
2020-01-16SenatePassed
2020-01-15SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-01-14SenateReferred To Appropriations
2020-01-10HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-01-09HousePassed
2020-01-08HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-01-08HouseReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback