MO SJR50 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Hearing Conducted S Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires students participating in any single-gender event or activity organized by a statewide activity association to participate in the event corresponding to the student's biological sex
Title
Requires students participating in any single-gender event or activity organized by a statewide activity association to participate in the event corresponding to the student's biological sex
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 50-O'Laughlin |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=26838235 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR50.pdf |