MO SJR37 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-10 - HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all meetings of apportionment commissions to be conducted in public and prohibits commission members from serving in the General Assembly for six years after service on commission
Title
Requires all meetings of apportionment commissions to be conducted in public and prohibits commission members from serving in the General Assembly for six years after service on commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-10 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-10 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Purusant Committee | |
2012-05-03 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-05-03 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Judicial Reform Committee | |
2012-05-03 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Judicial Reform Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Hearing Conducted H Special Standing Committee on Judicial Reform Committee | |
2012-04-12 | Referred H Special Standing Committee on Judicial Reform Committee | |
2012-03-19 | H Second Read | |
2012-03-08 | H First Read | |
2012-03-08 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2012-03-08 | Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Perfected, as amended | |
2012-03-06 | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(4678S01.02S) | |
2012-02-29 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-02-23 | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee to Floor | |
2012-02-20 | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SJR 37-Crowell | |
2011-12-14 | Prefiled |