MO SJR33 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Joint Resolutions for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Joint Resolutions for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Title
Modifies provisions relating to taxation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | H Calendar Senate Joint Resolutions for Third Reading |
2022-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2022-05-02 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2022-04-26 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2022-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-26 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-21 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-04-20 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-04-13 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-04-04 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2022-02-25 | House | H Second Read |
2022-02-24 | House | H First Read |
2022-02-24 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Oversight and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Perfected |
2022-02-16 | Senate | SS S adopted |
2022-02-16 | Senate | SA 1 to SS, as amended, S withdrawn |
2022-02-16 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(3463S02.05S) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered (Luetkemeyer)--(3463S02.02S) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | SS S offered (Koenig)--(3463S.02F) |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-01-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |