MO SJR28 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-21 - Hearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee
Pending: Senate Government Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that a nonpartisan judicial commission shall submit to the governor a list of all qualified nominees, rather than a list of three nominees, to fill a judicial vacancy in a court under the nonpartisan court plan

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that a nonpartisan judicial commission shall submit to the governor a list of all qualified nominees, rather than a list of three nominees, to fill a judicial vacancy in a court under the nonpartisan court plan

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-21SenateHearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee
2018-01-18SenateSecond Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee
2018-01-03SenateS First Read--SJR 28-Hegeman
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback