MO SJR23 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 23-Sater, with SS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 23-Sater, with SS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to initiative petitions
Title
Modifies the law relating to initiative petitions
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 23-Sater, with SS (pending) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-20 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & withdrawn (Holsman)--(4618S02.02S) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | SS S offered (Emery)--(4618S.02F) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 23-Sater |
2015-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22246587 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR23.pdf |