MO SJR10 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - Motion to Do Pass - FAILED - H Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - Motion to Do Pass - FAILED - H Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Lowers the number of State Representatives from 163 to 103
Title
Lowers the number of State Representatives from 163 to 103
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] | Sen. Timothy Green [D] | Sen. Jim Lembke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Motion to Do Pass - FAILED - H Downsizing State Government Committee | |
2011-04-28 | Hearing Conducted H Downsizing State Government Committee | |
2011-04-26 | Referred H Downsizing State Government Committee | |
2011-04-22 | H Second Read | |
2011-04-21 | H First Read | |
2011-04-21 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2011-04-21 | Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2011-04-21 | Hearing Cancelled S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight | |
2011-04-07 | Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-04-07 | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-04-05 | Referred S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2011-04-05 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2011-04-04 | Perfected | |
2011-03-17 | Reported from S Governmental Accountability Committee to Floor | |
2011-03-09 | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee | |
2011-01-10 | S First Read--SJR 10-Lembke and Green |