MO SCR52 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred H Children and Families
Pending: House Children And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred H Children and Families
Pending: House Children And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the societal harms brought by pornography and the need for education, prevention, research, and policy change
Title
Recognizes the societal harms brought by pornography and the need for education, prevention, research, and policy change
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Referred H Children and Families |
2018-05-10 | House | H Second Read |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Reported to the House |
2018-05-09 | Senate | S adopted |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-03-06 | Senate | S Offered--SCR 52-Emery |