MO SCR4 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-22 - Signed by House Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Applies to Congress for the calling of an Article V convention of states to propose certain amendments to the United States Constitution which place limits on the federal government

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Applies to Congress for the calling of an Article V convention of states to propose certain amendments to the United States Constitution which place limits on the federal government

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-12 - House - House: SCR 4 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SCR 4 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: SCR 4 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22HouseSigned by House Speaker
2017-05-22HouseSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2017-05-22HouseReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2017-05-12HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2017-05-12HouseH Third Read and Passed
2017-05-09HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2017-05-09HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2017-04-26HouseReferred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
2017-04-26HouseReported Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight
2017-04-25HouseVoted Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight
2017-04-25HouseHearing Conducted H Special Committee on Government Oversight
2017-04-19HouseReferred H Special Committee on Government Oversight
2017-04-18HouseH Second Read
2017-04-13HouseH First Read
2017-04-13SenateS Third Read and Passed
2017-04-13SenatePoint of order was well taken
2017-04-12SenatePoint of order - Resolution is not divisible (Kehoe) - Taken under advisement
2017-04-12SenateMotion to divide the question (Schaaf)
2017-03-02SenateReported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2017-03-02SenateVoted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2017-02-07SenateHearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2017-01-10SenateReferred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2017-01-05SenateS First Read--SCR 4-Kehoe

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback