MO SCR4 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-17 - Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes the Joint Interim Committee on Funding for Elementary and Secondary Education to study the elementary and secondary education foundation formula

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the Joint Interim Committee on Funding for Elementary and Secondary Education to study the elementary and secondary education foundation formula

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17HouseReferred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
2013-05-13SenateReported to the House
2013-05-13SenateS adopted
2013-05-08SenateReported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor
2013-04-30SenateVoted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2013-04-16SenateHearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2013-01-29SenateReferred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2013-01-24SenateS Offered--SCR 4-Schmitt, et al

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback