MO SCR36 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates every November as National American History and Founders Month
Title
Designates every November as National American History and Founders Month
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | S First Read--SCR 36-Hough |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=29449514 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR36.pdf |