MO SCR35 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-12 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates May 13, 2015, as Jump Day
Title
Designates May 13, 2015, as Jump Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | H adopted |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) |
2015-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Trade & Tourism |
2015-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Trade & Tourism |
2015-05-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H Trade & Tourism |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred H Trade & Tourism |
2015-04-27 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported to the House |
2015-04-23 | Senate | S adopted |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | S offered--SCR 35-Schmitt |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=6817977 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/15info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR35.pdf |