MO SCR21 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Applies to Congress for the calling of a convention to propose certain amendments to the United States Constitution which place limits on the federal government
Title
Applies to Congress for the calling of a convention to propose certain amendments to the United States Constitution which place limits on the federal government
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dixon [R] | Sen. Ed Emery [R] | Rep. Wayne Wallingford [R] | Sen. David Sater [R] |
Sen. Mike Moon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-05-07 | House | Referred H Select Committee on General Laws (Pursuant to H Rule 27.7) |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Government Efficiency |
2015-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Government Efficiency |
2015-05-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Government Efficiency |
2015-04-28 | House | Referred H Government Efficiency |
2015-04-23 | House | H Second Read |
2015-04-22 | House | H First Read |
2015-04-22 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2015-04-22 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2015-04-21 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Dixon)--(2098S02.04S) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor |
2015-03-31 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 21, 19 & 23) S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee (2098S.02C) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | S First Read--SCR 20-Dixon, et al |