MO SCR2 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the U.S. Congress to replace the statue of Thomas Hart Benton in the Statuary Hall of the U.S. Capitol with a statue of Harry S Truman

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the U.S. Congress to replace the statue of Thomas Hart Benton in the Statuary Hall of the U.S. Capitol with a statue of Harry S Truman

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House: SCR 2 SCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-16HouseH Third Read and Passed
2019-05-08HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-08HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-06HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-06HouseReported Do Pass H General Laws
2019-05-06HouseVoted Do Pass H General Laws
2019-04-17HouseHearing Conducted H General Laws
2019-04-10HouseReferred H General Laws
2019-02-07HouseH Second Read
2019-02-06HouseH First Read
2019-02-06SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-01-31SenateReported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-29SenateVoted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-22SenateHearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-14SenateSecond Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-01-10SenateS First Read--SCR 2-Hegeman

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback