MO SCR15 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy
Pending: House Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-22 - Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy
Pending: House Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes June as "Scoliosis Awareness Month" in Missouri
Title
Establishes June as "Scoliosis Awareness Month" in Missouri
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | House | Referred H Health and Mental Health Policy |
2021-04-22 | House | H Second Read |
2021-04-21 | House | H First Read |
2021-04-20 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | S First Read |