MO SCR15 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 15-Burlison
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 15-Burlison
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates procedures for the appointment of commissioners to a convention called under Article V of the U.S. Constitution
Title
Creates procedures for the appointment of commissioners to a convention called under Article V of the U.S. Constitution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Resolutions Calendar - Reported from Committee--SCR 15-Burlison |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | S First Read--SCR 15-Burlison |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=2950011 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR15.pdf |