MO SB968 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies several provisions relating to higher education financial aid for members of the military and their families
Title
Modifies several provisions relating to higher education financial aid for members of the military and their families
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] | Rep. Charlie Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 968 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 968 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 113 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 968 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 968 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 113 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: SB 968 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-13 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2016-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-11 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-05-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-05-03 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-05-03 | House | Reported Do Pass H Veterans |
2016-05-03 | House | Voted Do Pass H Veterans |
2016-05-03 | House | Hearing Conducted H Veterans |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred H Veterans |
2016-04-25 | House | H Second Read |
2016-04-21 | House | H First Read |
2016-04-21 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-04-12 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2016-04-12 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Pearce)--(6003S02.03S) |
2016-04-12 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Brown)--(6003S02.02S) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee, with SCS |
2016-03-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (6003S.02C) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2016-01-25 | Senate | S First Read--SB 968-Brown |