MO SB967 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires motor vehicle dealers to collect and remit sales taxes on sales of motor vehicles
Title
Requires motor vehicle dealers to collect and remit sales taxes on sales of motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled |