MO SB96 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 96-Sater and Emery
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 96-Sater and Emery
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits certain selective abortions relating to sex, race, or Down Syndrome
Title
Prohibits certain selective abortions relating to sex, race, or Down Syndrome
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] | Sen. Ed Emery [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 96-Sater and Emery |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2017-01-04 | Senate | S First Read--SB 96-Sater and Emery |
2016-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=57095319 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/pdf-bill/intro/SB96.pdf |