MO SB94 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate Jobs, Economic Development And Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate Jobs, Economic Development And Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides loan assistance programs to businesses for energy efficiency improvements
Title
Provides loan assistance programs to businesses for energy efficiency improvements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing Scheduled S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-01-12 | S First Read--SB 94-Munzlinger |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4074440 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB94.pdf |