MO SB921 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to victims of crime
Title
Modifies provisions relating to victims of crime
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 921 (HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, & HA 6, A.A.) BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 145 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 921 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House: SB 921 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 921 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 142 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House: SB 921 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 147 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-12 | Senate | CCR H adopted |
2016-05-12 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed--(5905S.04S) |
2016-05-12 | House | CCR S offered & adopted--(5905S04.1SR) |
2016-05-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-09 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-09 | House | H distributes CCR |
2016-05-03 | House | S conferees appointed: Riddle, Pearce, Munzlinger, Schupp, Curls |
2016-05-03 | House | H conferees appointed: Franklin, Solon, Pfautsch, Montecillo, Kirkton |
2016-05-03 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2016-05-03 | House | S refuses to concur in HA 1, as amended, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5 & HA 6, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2016-05-02 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 6, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 6 H offered & adopted (Frederick)--(5905H02.23H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 6 H offered (Barnes)--(5905H02.16H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 5 H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(5905S02.21H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 4 H offered & adopted (Walker)--(5905S02.05H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 3 H offered & adopted (Jones)--(5905S02.19H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Pfautsch)--(5905S02.09H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 1, as amended, H adopted |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 1 to HA 1 H offered & adopted (Kirkton)--(5905S02.12H) |
2016-05-02 | House | HA 1 H offered (Franklin)--(5905S02.07H) |
2016-04-21 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2016-04-21 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred H Select Committee on State and Local Governments (Pursuant to H Rule 27.13) |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass H Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness |
2016-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass H Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness |
2016-04-18 | House | Hearing Conducted H Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred H Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness |
2016-04-12 | House | H Second Read |
2016-04-11 | House | H First Read |
2016-04-11 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-04-06 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2016-04-06 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Pearce)--(5905S02.01S) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee w/SCS |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (5905S.02C) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | S First Read--SB 921-Riddle |