MO SB919 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to intoxicating liquor
Title
Modifies provisions relating to intoxicating liquor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 919 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 106 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 919 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 919 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 919 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 106 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - House - House: SB 919 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-12 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-12 | House | HCS H defeated |
2016-04-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) |
2016-04-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) |
2016-03-31 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Commerce (Pursuant to H Rule 27.4) |
2016-03-31 | House | Reported Do Pass H Small Business w/HCA 1 |
2016-03-30 | House | Voted Do Pass H Small Business w/Amendments |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing Conducted H Small Business |
2016-03-29 | House | Referred H Small Business |
2016-03-07 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-03 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-03 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-03-02 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2016-03-02 | Senate | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Kehoe)--(5244S07.05S) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 2 to SS for SCS S adopted |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-02-29 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Schmitt)--(5244S07.11S) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-02-24 | Senate | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Dixon)--(5244S07.08S) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(5244S07.01F) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Schmitt)--(5244S.07F) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee w/SCS |
2016-02-03 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (5244S.04C) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-14 | Senate | S First Read--SB 919-Schmitt |