MO SB918 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that a juvenile's attorney must have the right to be heard on a request that restraints not be used in juvenile court

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that a juvenile's attorney must have the right to be heard on a request that restraints not be used in juvenile court

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-17SenateVoted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2016-02-16SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2016-01-20SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2016-01-13SenateS First Read--SB 918-Wallingford

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback