MO SB905 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the effective date of the repeal and enactment of certain provisions of the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act
Title
Changes the effective date of the repeal and enactment of certain provisions of the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 905 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 134 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 905 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 123 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - House - House: SB 905 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 123 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-04 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-04 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-04-27 | House | Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-04-19 | House | Reported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-04-13 | House | Hearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-04-11 | House | Referred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-04-04 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-31 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-31 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent - EC adopted |
2016-03-31 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee - Consent |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Seniors, Families and Children Committee - Consent vote adopted (w/SCS SBs 905 & 992) (4660S.02C) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 905 & 992) S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (4660S.02C) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-01-13 | Senate | S First Read--SB 905-Sifton |