MO SB896 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 896-Shields and Crowell, with SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 896-Shields and Crowell, with SA 1 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the boards of the Missouri State Employees' Retirement System and the Missouri Department of Transportation and Highway Patrol Employees' Retirement System to create a defined contribution retirement plan for certain employees and judges
Title
Requires the boards of the Missouri State Employees' Retirement System and the Missouri Department of Transportation and Highway Patrol Employees' Retirement System to create a defined contribution retirement plan for certain employees and judges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 896-Shields and Crowell, with SA 1 (pending) | |
2010-03-31 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-03-31 | SA 1 S offered (Green)--(4934S01.07S) | |
2010-03-03 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-02-25 | Reported from S Veterans' Affairs, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee to Floor | |
2010-02-24 | Voted Do Pass S Veterans' Affairs, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee | |
2010-02-18 | Hearing Conducted S Veterans' Affairs, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Second Read and Referred S Veterans' Affairs, Pensions and Urban Affairs Committee | |
2010-02-04 | S First Read--SB 896-Shields and Crowell |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3247173 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/pdf-bill/intro/SB896.pdf |