MO SB888 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to criminal history records

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to criminal history records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (5668S.02C)
2018-02-05SenateHearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2018-01-22SenateSecond Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
2018-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 888-Rowden

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback