MO SB876 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-06 - Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to non-elections
Title
Modifies provisions relating to non-elections
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2018-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 876-Sater |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=71154270 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB876.pdf |