MO SB87 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to taxation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to taxation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: SB 87 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 112 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: SB 87 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 137 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 87 (HA 4) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 99 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 87 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 98 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 87 (HA 1 HA 3) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 87 (*HA 1 HA 3) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 46 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2019-05-09 - House - House: SB 87 (HA 3, A.A.) SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 101 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateSigned by Governor
2019-05-29SenateDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29SenateSigned by House Speaker
2019-05-29SenateSigned by Senate President Pro Tem
2019-05-29SenateReported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
2019-05-16SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-16HouseS Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2019-05-16HouseS concurs in HCS, as amended
2019-05-16HouseMotion to dissolve conference committee S adopted
2019-05-16HouseHouse conferees appointed: Swan, Shawan, Richey, Roberts (77), Carpenter
2019-05-16HouseH refuses to recede and grants conference
2019-05-16HouseS refuses to concur in HCS, as amended, and requests H recede or grant conference
2019-05-15HouseH Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
2019-05-15HouseHCS, as amended, H adopted
2019-05-13HouseReported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-13HouseVoted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
2019-05-09HouseReferred H Fiscal Review
2019-05-09HouseHA 7 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2019-05-09HouseHA 1 to HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black-137)--(0309H03.37H)
2019-05-09HouseHA 7 to HCS H offered (Gregory)--(0309H03.03H)
2019-05-09HouseHA 6 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2019-05-09HouseHA 2 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Shawan)--(0309H03.32H)
2019-05-09HouseHA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dohrman)--(0309H03.30H)
2019-05-09HouseHA 6 to HCS H offered (Plocher)--(0309H03.12H)
2019-05-09HouseHA 5 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2019-05-09HouseHA 1 to HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Roden)--(0309H03.17H)
2019-05-09HouseHA 5 to HCS H offered (Roberts-77)--(0309H03.05H)
2019-05-09HouseHA 4 to HCS H offered & defeated (Francis)--(0309H03.13H)
2019-05-09HouseHA3 to HCS, as amended, H adopted
2019-05-09HouseHA 2 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Carpenter)--(0309H03.27H)
2019-05-09HouseHA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & defeated (Rowland)--(0309H03.26H)
2019-05-09HouseHA 3 to HCS H offered (Coleman-32)--(0309H03.10H)
2019-05-09HouseHA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Christofanelli)--(0309H03.21H)
2019-05-09HouseHA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gregory)--(0309H03.14H)
2019-05-08HouseBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2019-05-02HouseReported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-05-02HouseVoted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-04-29HouseReferred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
2019-04-29HouseHCS Reported Do Pass H Ways and Means
2019-04-29HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means
2019-04-29HouseCommittee vote reconsidered
2019-04-24HouseHCS Voted Do Pass H Ways and Means
2019-04-17HouseHearing Conducted H Ways and Means
2019-04-10HouseReferred H Ways and Means
2019-04-08HouseH Second Read
2019-04-04HouseH First Read
2019-04-04SenateS Third Read and Passed
2019-03-28SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2019-03-27SenatePerfected, as amended
2019-03-27SenateSA 1 S offered & adopted (Wallingford)--(0309S01.01S)
2019-02-28SenateReported from S Ways and Means Committee
2019-02-26SenateVoted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee
2019-02-19SenateHearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee
2019-01-22SenateSecond Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee
2019-01-09SenateS First Read--SB 87-Wallingford
2018-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=13
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/intro/SB87.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/perf/SB87.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/House/HCS-SB/SB0087.pdf
Texthttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/pdf-bill/tat/SB87.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay460404633-654.pdf#640
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/066.018.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/066.017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/066.016.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/066.020.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/066.019.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/070.026.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills191/rollcalls/070.025.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6905161470-1606.pdf#1579
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/19info/Journals/RDay6805161470-1606.pdf#1579

Bill Comments

feedback