MO SB858 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 858-Kraus
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 858-Kraus
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to income taxes
Title
Modifies provisions relating to income taxes
Sponsors
Sen. Will Kraus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | S Formal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 858-Kraus |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee to Floor |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2014-02-12 | Senate | S First Read--SB 858-Kraus |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=30097722 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB858.pdf |