MO SB846 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding county law enforcement restitution funds
Title
Modifies provisions regarding county law enforcement restitution funds
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Parson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 846-Parson |
2016-01-05 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=23864242 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB846.pdf |