MO SB845 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to county financial statements
Title
Modifies provisions relating to county financial statements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - House - House: SB 845 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | In Conference |
2022-05-06 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Eslinger, Crawford, Gannon, Roberts, May |
2022-05-06 | House | Motion to allow S conferees to exceed the differences on section 50.815 and section 50.820 S adopted |
2022-05-06 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2022-05-05 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2022-05-05 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2022-05-05 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2022-05-05 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Basye)--(3796H03.02H) |
2022-05-05 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(3796H03.05H) |
2022-05-05 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(3796H03.11H) |
2022-05-04 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2022-05-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-05-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2022-04-28 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Local Government |
2022-04-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Local Government |
2022-04-21 | House | Hearing Conducted H Local Government |
2022-04-19 | House | Referred H Local Government |
2022-04-07 | House | H Second Read |
2022-04-06 | House | H First Read |
2022-04-06 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Motion to pass bill as consent taken by S Local Government and Elections Committee - Consent vote adopted |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |