MO SB843 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4866S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4866S.04C)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions of the Missouri Sunshine Law
Title
Modifies provisions of the Missouri Sunshine Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4866S.04C) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2014-02-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 843-Schaefer |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=29624826 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/14info/pdf-bill/intro/SB843.pdf |