MO SB827 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-02 - Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
States that certain records of municipally owned utilities may be closed under the Sunshine Law
Title
States that certain records of municipally owned utilities may be closed under the Sunshine Law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |