MO SB826 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies age range of children in license-exempt neighborhood youth development programs
Title
Modifies age range of children in license-exempt neighborhood youth development programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families, Veterans & Military Affairs Committee |
2022-01-05 | Senate | S First Read |
2021-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |