MO SB826 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Title
Modifies provisions relating to health care
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] | Rep. Robert Ross [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 826 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 127 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 826 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 128 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 826 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 126 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: SB 826 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 134 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: SB 826 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 124 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 826 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 128 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - House - House: SB 826 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 126 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: SB 826 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 134 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - House: SB 826 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 124 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (5029S.03C) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 826-Sater |
2017-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled |