MO SB822 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 822-Hegeman, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Allows evidence of failure to wear a seatbelt to prove comparative negligence or to mitigate damages

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows evidence of failure to wear a seatbelt to prove comparative negligence or to mitigate damages

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 822-Hegeman, with SCS & SS for SCS (pending)
2018-03-28SenateBill placed on Informal Calendar
2018-03-28SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & Ruled out of order (Schupp)--(4242S03.02S)
2018-03-28SenateSS for SCS S offered (Hegeman)--(4242S.03F)
2018-03-08SenateReported from S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee w/SCS
2018-02-15SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee (4242S.02C)
2018-02-01SenateHearing Conducted S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2018-01-18SenateSecond Read and Referred S Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety Committee
2018-01-03SenateS First Read--SB 822-Hegeman
2017-12-21SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback