MO SB821 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the offense of tampering with a judicial officer to include the Attorney General or his or her appointee
Title
Modifies the offense of tampering with a judicial officer to include the Attorney General or his or her appointee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 821-Hough |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=28764391 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/pdf-bill/intro/SB821.pdf |