MO SB82 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 88 & 82)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 88 & 82)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removes an expiration date of August 28, 2011 on state universities being able to convey land without authorization from the General Assembly and requires that such conveyances be done at fair market value
Title
Removes an expiration date of August 28, 2011 on state universities being able to convey land without authorization from the General Assembly and requires that such conveyances be done at fair market value
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Bill Combined (w/SCS SBs 88 & 82) | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee | |
2011-01-06 | S First Read--SB 82-Pearce |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4069716 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB82.pdf |