MO SB818 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the rulemaking authority of the Department of Health and Senior Services
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the rulemaking authority of the Department of Health and Senior Services
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Brown [R] | Sen. Mary Coleman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2024-03-06 | Senate | SA 2 to SS S offered (McCreery)--(3841S02.05S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | SA 1 to SS S offered & adopted (Brattin)--(3841S02.03S) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | SS S offered (Brown 26)--(3841S.02F) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |