MO SB816 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 816-Wieland, et al
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 816-Wieland, et al
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals the death penalty
Title
Repeals the death penalty
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Wieland [R] | Sen. Gina Walsh [D] | Sen. Rob Schaaf [R] | Sen. Jill Schupp [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 816-Wieland, et al |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws and Pensions Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws and Pensions Committee |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws and Pensions Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Hearing to be Continued S General Laws and Pensions Committee |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws and Pensions Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws and Pensions Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 816-Wieland and Walsh |
2015-12-16 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=22749318 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/16info/pdf-bill/intro/SB816.pdf |