MO SB815 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 815-Bartle, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-14 - S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 815-Bartle, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to elementary and secondary education
Title
Modifies provisions relating to elementary and secondary education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | S Calendar S Bills with H Amendments--SCS for SB 815-Bartle, with HCS, as amended | |
2010-05-13 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2010-05-13 | HCS, as amended, H adopted | |
2010-05-13 | HA 4 to HCS H offered & defeated (Pratt)--(3644L08.16H) | |
2010-05-13 | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Stream)--(3644L08.10H) | |
2010-05-13 | HA 2 to HCS H offered & defeated (Ruestman)--(3644L08.05H) | |
2010-05-13 | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dougherty)--(3644L08.01F) | |
2010-05-12 | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2010-05-12 | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2010-05-11 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2010-05-11 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2010-05-11 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2010-05-06 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-05-06 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-05-05 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-04-29 | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-04-26 | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-04-20 | H Second Read | |
2010-04-15 | S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-04-07 | Perfected | |
2010-04-07 | SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2010-04-07 | SA 7 to SCS S offered & defeated (Keaveny)--(3644S03.06S) | |
2010-04-07 | SA 6 to SCS S offered & defeated (Shoemyer)--(3644S03.04S) | |
2010-04-07 | SA 5 to SCS S offered & adopted (Pearce)--(3644S03.03S) | |
2010-04-07 | SA 4 to SCS S offered & adopted (Callahan)--(8005S10.01S) | |
2010-04-07 | SA 3 to SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2010-04-07 | SA 1 to SA 3 to SCS S offered & adopted (Rupp)--(3644S03.17S) | |
2010-04-07 | SA 3 to SCS S offered (Rupp)--(8114S10.01S) | |
2010-04-07 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-04-07 | SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Bartle)--(3644S03.08S) | |
2010-04-07 | SA 1 to SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2010-04-07 | SA 1 to SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Bray)--(3644S03.16S) | |
2010-04-07 | Bill Taken up for perfection | |
2010-04-06 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2010-04-06 | SA 1 to SCS S offered (Rupp)--(3644S03.02S) | |
2010-04-01 | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2010-03-31 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee (3644S.03C) | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2010-01-21 | S First Read--SB 815-Bartle |