MO SB814 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows an individual to deduct income earned through active military duty from their Missouri adjusted gross income
Title
Allows an individual to deduct income earned through active military duty from their Missouri adjusted gross income
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House: SB 814 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - House - House: SB 814 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-09 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-05-09 | House | S concurs in HCS |
2016-04-26 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2016-04-26 | House | HCS H adopted |
2016-04-26 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & defeated (Marshall)--(4441H03.07H) |
2016-04-14 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-14 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-13 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-13 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-11 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-05 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Social Services (Pursuant to H Rule 27.12) |
2016-04-05 | House | Reported Do Pass H Veterans w/HCA 1 |
2016-04-05 | House | Voted Do Pass H Veterans w/Amendments |
2016-04-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H Veterans |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred H Veterans |
2016-03-07 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-03 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-03 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported from S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability & Fiscal Oversight Committee (Fiscal Oversight) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred S Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-02-24 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S Ways and Means Committee w/SCS |
2016-02-04 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Ways and Means Committee (4441S.02C) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Ways and Means Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 814-Wallingford, et al |
2015-12-15 | Senate | Prefiled |