MO SB805 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 805-Onder, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to tax increment financing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to tax increment financing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-13SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 805-Onder, with SCS
2016-04-12SenateBill Placed on Informal Calendar
2016-03-03SenateReported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee w/SCS
2016-03-02SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee (4236S.04C)
2016-02-17SenateHearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
2016-01-12SenateSecond Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee
2016-01-06SenateS First Read--SB 805-Onder
2015-12-10SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback