MO SB788 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H Third Read and Passed, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H Third Read and Passed, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires appointment of St. Louis City circuit clerk
Title
Requires appointment of St. Louis City circuit clerk
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | H Third Read and Passed, as amended | |
2012-05-18 | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Jones-89)--(5390S02.06H) | |
2012-05-09 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-09 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-09 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-08 | Hearing Cancelled H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-07 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-05-07 | Reported Do Pass H Special Standing Committee on Judicial Reform Committee | |
2012-05-07 | Hearing Conducted H Special Standing Committee on Judicial Reform Committee | |
2012-05-03 | Referred H Special Standing Committee on Judicial Reform Committee | |
2012-05-03 | H Second Read | |
2012-05-02 | H First Read | |
2012-05-02 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-01 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-05-01 | Perfected | |
2012-05-01 | SCS, as amended, S adopted | |
2012-05-01 | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Keaveny)--(5390S02.02S) | |
2012-03-21 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-03-21 | Taken up for Perfection | |
2012-03-08 | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-03-05 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - (5390S.02C) | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-02-16 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2012-02-14 | S First Read--SB 788-Keaveny |