MO SB786 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to "whistle-blower's" protection for public employees
Title
Modifies provisions relating to "whistle-blower's" protection for public employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-02 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2018-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass H Judiciary |
2018-05-01 | House | Voted Do Pass H Judiciary |
2018-05-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H Judiciary |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred H Judiciary |
2018-04-10 | House | H Second Read |
2018-04-09 | House | H First Read |
2018-04-05 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2018-04-04 | Senate | SA 3 S withdrawn |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-26 | Senate | SA 3 S offered (Eigel)--(4451S02.07S) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | SA 2 S offered & adopted (Onder)--(4451S02.02S) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Schupp)--(4451S02.06S) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 786-Schupp |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled |