MO SB786 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-16 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to intoxicating liquor manufactured for personal or family use and licenses to sell liquor on boats
Title
Modifies provisions relating to intoxicating liquor manufactured for personal or family use and licenses to sell liquor on boats
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Schmitt [R] | Rep. Don Gosen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | House | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2014-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2014-05-05 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Hearing Cancelled H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-23 | House | Referred H General Laws Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-17 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-17 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | S First Read--SB 786-Schmitt |